WV HB2849 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify the registration process of a registered pharmacy technician with an endorsement as a pharmacy technician or a registered pharmacy technician with a nuclear pharmacy technician certificate and to specify the duties each category is permitted to perform under direct or indirect supervision of a licensed pharmacist.
Title
Establishing different classes of pharmacy technicians
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Carl Martin [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 678) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 195) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 195) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 196, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 678) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-19 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 195) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |