WV HB2850 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that a commercial license instruction permit may be issued to persons 18 years of age who have held a graduated Class E, Class E or Class D license for at least one year. Current law requires a two year period.
Title
Relating to qualifications for commercial driver’s license
Sponsors
Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Anthony Paynter [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 453) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 325) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 325) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 453) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 325) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17E | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |