WV HB2855 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that rebate moneys collected by the State Auditor office may be used to operate and maintain accounting and transparency systems of the office.
Title
Allowing rebate moneys to be used for the operation and maintenance of accounting and transparency systems of the State Auditor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 229) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 229) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-06 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-06 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 3 | 10d | Amended Code | Citation Text |