WV HB2878 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to updating the controlled substances listed on schedule one
Title
Relating to updating the controlled substances listed on schedule one
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 138) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 128) (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 128) (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 138) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 128) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-08 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 2 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |