WV HB2881 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to alter the color scheme for county vehicle registration plates; alter the color scheme for city or municipality vehicle registration plates; provide that all county vehicle registration plates, title certificates, and registration certificates shall expire on December 31, 2019; provide for exemptions for certain county Class A license plates; require all counties to obtain a new title certificate, registration certificate, and registration plate for all county vehicles prior to January 1, 2020; require renewal every two years; provide that all city and municipal registration plates, title certificates, and registration certificates shall expire on December 31, 2019; provide for exemptions for certain city and municipal Class A license plates; require all cities or municipalities to obtain a new title certificate, registration certificate, and registration plate for all city or municipality vehicles prior to January 1, 2020; and require renewal every two years.
Title
Altering the color scheme for county vehicle registration plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2881 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |