WV HB2882 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a health professionals’ student loan program; health sciences tuition program. The bill provides in-state tuition rates to out-of-state medical and osteopathic students who agree to practice for a specific time within West Virginia.
Title
Creating a health professionals’ student loan programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 363) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 363) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | House | To Education then Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |