WV HB2895 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow crime victims to petition a court to obtain restraining orders to prevent persons who committed specified crimes against the victim from living in proximity or knowingly coming into contact the victim, if the victim proves to the court that this will cause or has caused the victim emotional distress.
Title
Allowing victims of certain crimes to get a restraining order
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 328) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 328) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 11A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |