WV HB2901 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow a licensed racetrack to establish a secondary location for racetrack video lottery terminals and racetrack table games at a location within the county as approved by the lottery commission.
Title
Allowing for the establishment of a secondary location for racetrack video lottery terminals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 270) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 243) (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 243) (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 270) |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 269) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 243) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 23 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |