WV HB2909 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the definition of “termination” and to add a definition of “reduction in coverage” for property insurance law.
Title
Relating to definition of terms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB485 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 144, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
SB524 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - To Banking and Insurance
HB2993 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Banking and Insurance
SB524 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - To Banking and Insurance
HB2993 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 17A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |