WV HB2934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize interactive wagering as West Virginia Lottery interactive wagering activities.
Title
West Virginia Lottery Interactive Wagering Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 679) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 455) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 271) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 455) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 271) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2019-03-28 | House | Became law without Governor's signature |
2019-03-09 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 679) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 455) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Lindsay Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Trump Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amends pend. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 271) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-08 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22E | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22E | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |