WV HB2958 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to give the State Auditor the authority to conduct regular examinations of the finances of volunteer fire companies.
Title
Authorizing the State Auditor to conduct regular financial examinations or audits of all volunteer fire companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 357) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 209) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 357) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 209) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) |
2019-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 357) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 209) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |