WV HB2974 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt any business relating to transporting scrap tires, waste tires, or other used tires to storage, disposal, or recycling locations from this chapter.Â
Title
Exempting businesses relating to transporting certain used tires to storage, disposal, or recycling locations from provisions of chapter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 331) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 303) (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - House reconsidered its action (Roll No. 302) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 301) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 303) (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - House reconsidered its action (Roll No. 302) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 301) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 331) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 303) |
2019-02-25 | House | House reconsidered its action (Roll No. 302) |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 301) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2974 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24A | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |