WV HB2982 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend and update the laws relating to auctions by providing for definitions; providing for exemptions to license requirements; providing for June 30 as the date all licenses expire; establishing certain conditions for auctioneers to continue working after license expiration; providing for record retention requirements; providing for exams held twice a year; providing for auctioneers to submit to background checks; providing for authorization to conduct and use information relating to background checks; providing for confidentiality of background checks; providing for penalties for an unlicensed auctioneer; providing for additional circumstances to revoke a license; providing for written contracts with auctioneers and owners of property; and providing for auction houses and business entities to enter into contracts with auctioneers.
Title
Amending and updating the laws relating to auctioneers
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] |
Del. Carl Martin [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 680) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 456) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 456) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 680) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 456) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendments withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 237) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB619 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 2C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 5b | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 6c | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2C | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |