WV HB3007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of Agriculture to require certain applicants for positions with the Department of Agriculture to submit to state and federal criminal background checks.
Title
Authorizing the Commissioner of Agriculture to require background checks
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] |
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 345) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 415) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 313) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 415) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 313) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 345) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 415) |
2019-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 313) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 238) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |