WV HB3045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt complimentary hotel rooms provided by a hotel operator to guests without charge from the hotel occupancy tax.
Title
Exempting certain complimentary hotel rooms from hotel occupancy tax
Sponsors
Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. John Williams [D] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 359) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 294) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 294) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 255, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 359) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 294) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |