WV HB3061 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a volunteer certification so that a health or mental health professional may provide volunteer services in this state without having to have a license issued by this state
Title
Creating a volunteer certification so that a health or mental health professional may provide volunteer services in this state without having to have a license issued by this state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-28 | House Message received | |
2011-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 148) | |
2011-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-23 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-15 | To House Government Organization | |
2011-02-15 | Do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2011-02-08 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-08 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |