WV HB3070 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the West Virginia State Police Retirement System Plan B accrued benefit for Plan B members to three percent beginning July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the accrued benefit of retirees in the West Virginia State Police Retirement System
Sponsors
Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] |
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Lisa Zukoff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |