WV HB3102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise certain wine code sections to permit wine alternating wine proprietorships as permitted under federal law; to clarify wine sampling procedures for wineries and farm wineries up to 2 fluid ounces at certain fairs and festivals along with wine bottle sales for off-premises consumption only; to permit the auction of wine at certain charitable events; to clarify liquor and wine must be sold by the drink at certain on-premises licenses but that wine bottle sales are permitted under certain conditions at certain on-premises locations; to permit Division II and II colleges to apply for private wine stadium licenses; providing a 30 day licensing requirement to issue or deny a license; and to encourage licensees to apply for renewals of their license in a timely and effective manner but if they fail to do so a re-activation fee will be applied prior to their renewal.
Title
Creating alternating wine proprietorships for wineries and farm wineries
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 342) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |