WV HB3105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the WVABCA to request the assistance of local law enforcement; clarifying that consumption of alcoholic liquors in public is unlawful; clarifying that West Virginia licensees can only sell liquor by the drink; clarifying certain licensing requirements for licensure; clarifying prohibition on liquor bottle sales in Class A licenses; more clearly stating that BYOB’s are illegal; permitting certain conduct such as wine bottle sales and frozen drink machines; creating a private fair and festival license; for liquor wine and beer sales at a festival; create a private hotel license; creating a private 9-hole golf course license; permitting a private resort hotel to have inner-connection with a resident brewer who has a brewpub; providing a 30-day requirement to issue or deny a completed license application; creating a reactivation fee for licensees who fail to timely file their renewal application and pay their annual license fees; permitting a license privilege for certain licensees to operate a connected but separately operated Class A on-premises license and a Class B off-premises license; clarifying that certain state licensed gaming is permissible in a private club; and permitting minors to attend a private 9-hole golf course and a private fair or festival under certain conditions.
Title
Permitting the Alcohol Beverage Control Administration to request the assistance of law enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/19 |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 2 | 17a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 7 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 8 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |