WV HB3127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - House rejected (Roll No. 370)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - House rejected (Roll No. 370)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow home-schooled students to participate in secondary school extracurricular activities.
Title
Relating to the Secondary School Activities Commission and participation by home schooled students
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 370) (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 369) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 353) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 352) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to table motion to discharge from committee and read a first time rejected (Roll No. 274) (Y: 44 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 369) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 353) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 352) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Motion to table motion to discharge from committee and read a first time rejected (Roll No. 274) (Y: 44 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 370) |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 369) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 353) |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 352) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee discharged as to H. B. 3127 |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to discharge committee and read a first time adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to table motion to discharge from committee and read a first time rejected (Roll No. 274) |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Education |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3127 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - House rejected (Roll No. 370)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |