WV HB3131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 204, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 204, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing salary adjustments to employees of the Department of Health and Human Resources
Title
Relating to providing salary adjustments to employees of the Department of Health and Human Resources
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] |
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 716) (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 503) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 343) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 503) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 343) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 204, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 716) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 503) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 343) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-13 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 5 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 5 | 4c | New Code | See Bill Text |