WV HB3140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Division of Natural Resources Infrastructure
Title
Relating to the Division of Natural Resources Infrastructure
Sponsors
Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 417) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 416) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 318) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 317) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 347) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 346) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 416) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 318) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 317) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 347) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 346) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/7/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/7/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 417) |
2019-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 416) |
2019-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 318) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 317) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/19 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 347) |
2019-02-26 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 346) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |