WV HB3144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
North Central Appalachian Coal Severance Tax Rebate Act
Title
North Central Appalachian Coal Severance Tax Rebate Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 681) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 460) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 460) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 257, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 681) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 460) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate reconsidered amendment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/7/19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 373) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13EE | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |