WV HB3145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to student financial aid resources
Title
Relating to student financial aid resources
Sponsors
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] |
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 350) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 305) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 305) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 350) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 305) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Originating in House Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18C | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |