WV HB4002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a felony crime relating to drug delivery resulting in death
Title
Creating a felony crime relating to drug delivery resulting in death
Sponsors
Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] | Del. Caleb Hanna [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] |
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 38) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 4 | 416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |