WV HB4006 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the processes through which professional development is delivered for those who provide public education
Title
Revising the processes through which professional development is delivered for those who provide public education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 511) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 454) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 34) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 33) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Postponed indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 454) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 34) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 33) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Postponed indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 511) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 454) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 34) |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 33) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Motion to postpone indefinitely rejected (Roll No. 31) |
2018-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-19 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-12 | House | To House Education |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-12 | House | To Education then Finance |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |