WV HB4010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the licensing requirement for certain casino employees
Title
Changing the licensing requirement for certain casino employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 15) |
2020-01-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2020-01-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-17 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/20/20 |
2020-01-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-14 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22C | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |