WV HB4011 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reorganizing various boards and authorities for the licensing and oversight of trades, occupations, and professions
Title
Reorganizing various boards and authorities for the licensing and oversight of trades, occupations, and professions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 41) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - Motion to have bill Recommitted to Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 40) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - Motion to have bill Recommitted to Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 40) (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 41) |
2020-01-27 | House | Motion to have bill Recommitted to Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 40) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-09 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-09 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |