WV HB4024 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rewrite and change the direct cremation and direct burial expenses for indigent persons. The bill decreases the amount the Department of Health and Human Resources may pay for cremation or burial from $1,250 to $1,000. The bill makes certain relatives of the indigent person liable for direct cremation or direct burial expenses. The bill authorizes the Department of Health and Human Resources to recover direct cremation or direct burial expenses from relatives liable for those costs. The bill requires affidavits be signed and filed. The bill makes direct cremation the preferred method and provides an exception. The bill defines terms. The bill establishes a criminal penalty. §9-5-18 is repealed. §9-5-9 has been completely rewritten; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Relating generally to direct cremation or direct burial expenses for indigent persons
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] |
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 382) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 382) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 285) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 98) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 97) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 382) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 285) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 98) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 97) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 120, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 |
2018-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 382) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 382) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 285) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 285) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/18 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/26/18 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/23/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/22/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 98) |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 97) |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-15 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-11 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 5 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |