WV HB4061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health Benefit Plan Network Access and Adequacy Act
Title
Health Benefit Plan Network Access and Adequacy Act
Sponsors
Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] |
Del. Sammi Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 742) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 546) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 546) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 742) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Judiciary Title amendment adopted |
2020-03-07 | Senate | HH&R Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 546) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/5/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | H&HR Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/4/20 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 127) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 4u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ff | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8r | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |