WV HB4094 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing the Foster Care Ombudsman
Title
Continuing the Foster Care Ombudsman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 624) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 624) |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 452) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Children and Families |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Children and Families then Finance |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 59) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2020-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-01-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB301 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 9 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 9 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |