WV HB4142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a $6,000 pay increase spread over a period of three years, to all employees of the Division of Corrections, Division of Juvenile Services, and West Virginia Regional Jail and Correctional Facility Authority.
Title
Providing certain employees of the Division of Corrections, Division of Juvenile Services, and West Virginia Regional Jail and Correctional Facility Authority a salary adjustment
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 333) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 77) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 75) (Y: 40 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 74) (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 73) (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 77) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 75) (Y: 40 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 74) (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 73) (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 333) |
2018-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 288) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/18 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/26/18 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/23/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/21/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-13 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 77) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 75) |
2018-02-09 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 74) |
2018-02-09 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 73) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB262 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - To Government Organization