WV HB4154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the 2018 Regulatory Reform Act.
Title
Establishing the 2018 Regulatory Reform Act
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 229) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 229) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2018-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Similar To) 2018-02-23 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 8 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 8 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |