WV HB4218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the requirements of a certificate of merit.
Title
Relating to medical professional liability
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 233) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-28 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 233) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-19 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |