WV HB4275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the law enforcement authority of the director and officers of the division of protective services, to exempt certain safety and security information from disclosure under the West Virginia Freedom of Information Act, and to clarify that agencies installing electronic security systems designed to connect with the division’s command center must be approved prior to installation.
Title
Relating to the law-enforcement authority of the director and officers of the division of protective services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 387) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 62) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 62) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 217, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/15/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 387) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 62) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-24 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |