WV HB4352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the use of post-criminal conduct in professional and occupational initial licensure or certification in decision making
Title
Removing the use of post-criminal conduct in professional and occupational initial licensure or certification in decision making
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 396) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 387) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 109) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 387) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 109) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 396) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 387) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 109) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - To Government Organization
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 3B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3B | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |