WV HB4357 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this to establish the West Virginia Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act. The bill makes legislative findings. The bill defines terms. The bill provides for access to public right-of-way for the collocation of small wireless facilities. The bill provides for certain permit requirements. The bill requires permits to be issued on a nondiscriminatory basis. The bill provides for the collection of fees and setting the amount of fees. The bill provides for certain local zoning, indemnification, insurance, and bonding requirements.
Title
West Virginia Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 250) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 250) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-30 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31H | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31H | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |