WV HB4402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to designation of early voting locations
Title
Relating to designation of early voting locations
Sponsors
Del. Andrew Robinson [D] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Del. Amanda Estep-Burton [D] |
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Kevan Bartlett [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Del. Andrew Byrd [D] |
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 340) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-17 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-17 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |