WV HB4496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the specific mandate of the Board of Risk and Insurance Management to purchase liability insurance for the Division of Corrections
Title
Removing the specific mandate of the Board of Risk and Insurance Management to purchase liability insurance for the Division of Corrections
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Dianna Graves [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] |
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Nathan Brown [D] |
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 63) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 65) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 65) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 200, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Approved by Governor 2/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-17 | House | Approved by Governor 2/17/20 |
2020-02-11 | House | To Governor 2/11/20 |
2020-02-13 | House | To Governor 2/11/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Governor 2/11/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 63) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 65) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |