WV HB4509 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Transferring the Parole Board to the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation for purposes of administrative and other support

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transferring the Parole Board to the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation for purposes of administrative and other support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 628) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 716) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 503) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 111) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 628)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 716)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 503)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-04SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-04SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-07SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-07SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 111)
2020-02-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-04HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-03HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-23HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-23HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback