WV HB4510 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 63, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 63, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting bodily intrusion by an inmate upon any person at any correctional facility
Title
Prohibiting bodily intrusion by an inmate upon any person at any correctional facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 474) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 67) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 67) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 63, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/12/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 474) |
2020-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 402) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 67) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB519 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |