WV HB4563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the severance tax on oil and gas produced from low producing wells.
Title
Relating to the severance tax on oil and gas produced from low producing wells
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2018-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-21 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Energy |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-13 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |