WV HB4573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid subrogation liens of the Department of Health and Human Resources
Title
Relating to Medicaid subrogation liens of the Department of Health and Human Resources
Sponsors
Del. Jordan Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 734) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 733) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 352) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 733) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 352) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 734) |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 733) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 509) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 352) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |