WV HB4607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the banning of the use of recreational drones at state parks except within 150 feet from lodging.
Title
Establishing certain criteria for the restricted operation of drones within State Parks, Forests, and Rail Trails
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 569) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 568) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 509) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 568) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 509) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 569) |
2018-03-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 568) |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Voice) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 509) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 210) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |