WV HB4717 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Seizure and Forfeiture Reporting Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seizure and Forfeiture Reporting Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 719) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 513) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 363) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-17HouseTo Governor 3/17/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 719)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 513)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateWeld Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateIhlenfeld Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-04SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-04SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2020-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 363)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-06HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A7708New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback