WV HB4746 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a registry of persons with a communication disability
Title
Establishing a registry of persons with a communication disability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-07 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 2 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 2 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 29 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |