WV HB4872 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying the criminal penalties imposed on a parent, guardian or custodian for child abuse
Title
Modifying the criminal penalties imposed on a parent, guardian or custodian for child abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 327) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 327) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8D | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |