WV HB4956 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - To Energy, Industry, and Mining
Pending: Senate Energy, Industry and Mining Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - To Energy, Industry, and Mining
Pending: Senate Energy, Industry and Mining Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to the partition of real property
Title
Relating generally to the partition of real property
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 264) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 264) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 4 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 4 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |