WV HCR26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

George” Roush Memorial Bridge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

George” Roush Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-06SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-03-05SenateReported be adopted, with amendment
2019-02-18SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-18SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-18SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-15HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2019-02-15HouseReported by the Clerk
2019-02-15HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2019-02-14HouseBe adopted
2019-02-12HouseTo House Rules
2019-02-12HouseBy substitute, be adopted, but first to Rules
2019-01-22HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-22HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Rules
2019-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback