WV HCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Charleston Police Capt. Jerry D. Hill Memorial Bridge
Title
Charleston Police Capt. Jerry D. Hill Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-22 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-22 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |